Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST CHELTENHAM TEAM MINISTRY
Charity number: 1133887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rod Paterson | Chair | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ewins | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Foster | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael William Eric Horne | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Rhys Topping | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Denley | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Wynn | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Ewins | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Binks | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Joshua Denley | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd Kilford | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Philip Potter | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Britten Southam | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pat Bowen | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Joyce | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|||||
PAULINE MARGARET CARTER | Trustee | 19 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.