Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TAMWORTH

Charity number: 1133982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £457.63k £695.42k £240.02k £661.37k £196.84k
Total expenditure £695.54k £341.64k £298.81k £239.83k £242.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £586.92k N/A £593.90k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £37.79k N/A £18.80k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £57.10k N/A £19.52k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A £13.03k N/A £29.14k N/A
Income - Other N/A £576 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £427.57k N/A £500.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £297.44k N/A £239.83k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £1.10k N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £4.74k N/A £4.08k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £43.09k N/A £0 N/A