Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST AUGUSTINE WITH ST JOHN, KILBURN

Charity number: 1132507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £132.23k £183.25k £163.10k £83.53k £232.91k
Total expenditure £114.39k £120.31k £112.35k £76.43k £237.27k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.66k N/A N/A N/A