Trustees FREE THE BEARS UK

Charity number: 1135682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jon Cracknell Chair 12 February 2014
None on record
Giles Jason Clark Trustee 05 March 2021
THE GORILLA ORGANIZATION
Received: On time
Dr Claudia Hartley Trustee 08 July 2020
None on record
Sarah Jane Moran Trustee 05 January 2014
None on record
Matthew Peter Hunt Trustee 27 April 2010
None on record
Mary Julia Hutton Trustee
None on record