THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY AND ST BARTHOLOMEW, HAMPTON IN ARDEN

Charity number: 1133937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £105.40k £117.52k £105.45k £115.38k £94.12k
Total expenditure £119.27k £125.93k £104.98k £114.72k £117.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A