THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY AND ST BARTHOLOMEW, HAMPTON IN ARDEN

Charity number: 1133937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR MARY HELEN CHARLTON Trustee 04 October 2011 None on record
JULIE ANNE MOORE BA Trustee None on record
DR DAVID SHAW MOORE Trustee None on record
Debby Read Trustee 25 April 2016 None on record
Phil Joannu Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Helen Wood Trustee 25 April 2016 None on record
MICHAEL THOMAS PURCELL Trustee None on record
Debby Walker Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Vickki Lorraine Simkin Trustee 24 April 2017
HAMPTON-IN-ARDEN SOCIETY Received: On time
Mike Beasley Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
MRS VICKEY CARDWELL Trustee None on record
REV Stuart Christopher Laurence Dimes Chair 14 November 2017
BARSTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
Nick Hodgson Trustee 29 April 2014 None on record
Duncan Stuart Watson BSc FIA Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
PETER MORRIS Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
SHEILA FIROOZEH WYATT MEd, MSc Trustee 23 April 2015 None on record
DAVID COLMAN Trustee 22 May 2012 None on record