WETHERBY ST JAMES CHURCH CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1133514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £34.87k £48.89k £51.22k £56.15k £31.72k
Total expenditure £53.54k £43.92k £54.43k £61.04k £28.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A