WETHERBY ST JAMES CHURCH CENTRE TRUST

Charity number: 1133514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lorna Johnson Trustee 30 November 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON Received: 14 days late
BOB GREENE Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON Received: 14 days late
ROBERT JAMES HASKINS Trustee
WETHERBY ARTS FESTIVAL Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON Received: 14 days late
Helen Margaret Harper Trustee 21 April 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON Received: 14 days late
VAL LUMSDEN Trustee 07 May 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON Received: 14 days late
REV BRENDAN ANTHONY GIBLIN Chair 05 October 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON Received: 14 days late
DAVID ANDREW BEWELL Trustee None on record
Kathryn Wenn Trustee 18 April 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON Received: 14 days late
Elaine Kerel Hainsworth Trustee 19 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON Received: 14 days late
SUSAN DEBORAH TAYLOR Trustee 21 April 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON Received: 14 days late
Julie Ann Hayman Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record
ALAN GRIMES Trustee 21 June 2012
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON Received: 14 days late
JEAN HEATON Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON Received: 14 days late
Rosemary Rooke Trustee 18 April 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON Received: 14 days late
Jaqueline Taylor Trustee 21 April 2016 None on record
Emma Beddoe Trustee 27 April 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON Received: 14 days late
David Startup Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record
David William York Trustee 27 November 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON Received: 14 days late
MARILYN SMITH Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WETHERBY WITH LINTON Received: 14 days late