Financial history BEDFORDSHIRE ESSEX AND HERTFORDSHIRE DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1133921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £334.41k £372.36k £358.88k £362.06k £383.19k
Total expenditure £346.67k £338.89k £480.68k £228.33k £340.25k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A