Financial history HINDE STREET METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1134023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £346.91k £306.77k £295.13k £327.27k £259.55k
Total expenditure £244.46k £411.19k £477.08k £274.65k £252.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A