Accounts and annual returns SOUNDMIX

Charity number: 1135281
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 108 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 108 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On time
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On time
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required