Financial history SOUNDMIX

Charity number: 1135281
Charity reporting is overdue by 75 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £14.10k £13.04k £18.49k £34.39k £25.04k
Total expenditure £17.45k £13.82k £18.04k £26.31k £32.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.00k