THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS WITH ST JOHN, HERTFORD

Charity number: 1134035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £138.76k £127.89k £135.74k £185.39k £107.31k
Total expenditure £149.44k £127.24k £133.09k £145.64k £132.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £10.00k £960