AIDUCATION INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 1136064
Charity reporting is overdue by 770 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/12/2017
Total gross income £5.62k £9.89k £2.23k £5.52k £5.28k
Total expenditure £1.56k £9.89k £2.23k £5.52k £5.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A