THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, KETTERING

Charity number: 1135658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £188.27k £172.37k £183.09k £186.95k £150.20k
Total expenditure £223.74k £180.67k £188.94k £203.16k £178.80k
Income from government contracts £676 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A