THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, KETTERING

Charity number: 1135658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev David Walsh Chair 04 September 2016
THE PETERBOROUGH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
Kay Short Trustee 17 March 2014 None on record
Hazel Goodman Trustee 01 January 2012
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE BEEKEEPERS' ASSOCIATION Received: On time
THE MOTHERS' UNION DIOCESE OF PETERBOROUGH Received: On time
Patricia Edkins Trustee 20 April 2016 None on record
Rose Byrne Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
MARTIN HILL Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
John McLaren Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
Christopher Turner Trustee 01 April 2019
CRANSLEY HOSPICE TRUST Received: On time
Victoria Jean Gascoyne Trustee 17 March 2014 None on record
SAM DEARDEN Trustee None on record
Rev Carys Walsh Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record