Financial history OPERA NOVA

Charity number: 1138924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.39k £6.62k £9.64k £3.00k £2.78k
Total expenditure £5.98k £5.79k £7.93k £2.70k £2.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A