THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN NUNTHORPE

Charity number: 1134124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carol Keen Trustee 26 March 2019 None on record
Margaret Gilland Cundall Trustee 26 March 2019 None on record
Graham Charles Hinton Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
Ivan James Samuel Lake Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record
DR GRAHAM JOHN HASSALL Trustee None on record
JANET ELIZABETH HINTON DCR Trustee None on record
DAVID YOUNG CENG, FIET Trustee
CLEVELAND SCIENTIFIC INSTITUTION Received: On time
Janet Barker Trustee 26 March 2019 None on record
LINDA MARY SMITH Trustee 02 September 2013 None on record
DAVID WILLIAM COOK Trustee None on record
Michael Arthur Arnott Trustee 02 September 2013 None on record
BRIAN DINSDALE OBE BA CFA Trustee 27 March 2018 None on record
Gary Cox Trustee 23 May 2019 None on record
Christine Lesley Young Trustee 24 April 2013 None on record