CHADIAN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1135688
Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 80 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 80 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 October 2019 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 05 November 2017 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required