Trustees THE METHODIST CHURCH - LIVERPOOL (SOUTH) CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1134958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

40 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev David John Goodwin Chair 01 September 2022
ELM HALL DRIVE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Ekpo Bassy Orok Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Andrew Adam Dunsmore Trustee 01 September 2021
ELM HALL DRIVE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rev Dr Clement Matarirano Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Pamela Zena Bellis Trustee 17 April 2021
VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Katherine Elizabeth Cook Trustee 17 April 2021
None on record
Alfred Ajayi Salami Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Stephen William Elliott Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Gillian Dover Trustee 01 September 2019
THE HALEWOOD LOCAL ECUMENICAL PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Judith Sutcliffe Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Ada Dorothy Peers Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Graham John Martin Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Abiodun Abbey Adepitun Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Anne Hudson Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Natasia Bullock Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Kim Julia Kershaw Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Jayne McLaren Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Peter Howard Wood Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Eleanor Anne Thomas Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Rev Peter Owen Hughes Trustee 01 September 2017
CHARITY OF MARY JANE CROSS
Received: On time
Rev Jennifer Christine Rayner Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Margaret Patricia Carolyn Harvey BA Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Mrs Kate Harrison Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Christine Margaret Bolton Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
Edna May Pye Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
Elizabeth Edwina Lloyd Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
Janine Gale McGuire Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
Linda Marian White Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
Mr Roger Heath Trustee 01 September 2013
ROTARY DISTRICT 1180 TRUST
Received: On time
WEST DERBY WASTE LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
ANDREW NEIL GILLESPIE Trustee
None on record
SUE STEEL Trustee
None on record
MR MARK HARRISON Trustee
None on record
Sandra Patterson Trustee
None on record
SHIRLEY NAOMI BANKS Trustee
None on record
CAROLYN MUNRO Trustee
None on record
Charles Robert Hardisty Trustee
THE OPENING DOORS PROJECT
Received: On time
JEAN WHARTON Trustee
GARSTON ONE STOP SHOP CONSORTIUM
Received: On time
Philip Antony Lodge Trustee
THE FOURTH DIMENSION TRUST
Overdue by 735 days
VALLEY COMMUNITY THEATRE
Received: On time
MRS PAM BOFFEY Trustee
THE ST HELENS CHORAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
ARTHUR EDGAR PYE Trustee
None on record