THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY'S, OLVESTON

Charity number: 1134397
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 November 2019 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 November 2019 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 July 2017 On time Download