THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY'S, OLVESTON

Charity number: 1134397
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GAIL VLYN MARY LOWE Trustee 26 April 2013 None on record
Fennella Orr Tait Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Philip Edward Savage Trustee 04 October 2020
OLVESTON PARISH HALL Received: On time
Debbie Harries Trustee 26 April 2013 None on record
SUE FARR Trustee None on record
JANET ANN MCBRIDE Trustee None on record
John Lindsey Henniker-Heaton Trustee 04 October 2020 None on record
Timothy Auburn Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
REV DAVID HUGH BONE MA Trustee None on record
Stephanie Fairhead Trustee 25 April 2016 None on record
David Lewis Prothero Trustee 26 April 2013 None on record
MIKE WRIGHT Trustee
OLVESTON CHURCH LANDS Received: On time
REV ANN LLOYD Trustee None on record
Audrey Margaret Shepherd Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
REVD DAVID SEFTON MOSS Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
GEORGE BERNARD AMOS Trustee None on record
Martin John Gibson Trustee 24 April 2016 None on record