Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DUKINFIELD ST JOHN

Charity number: 1134598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tim Hayes Chair
None on record
Andrew Knight Trustee 18 November 2021
None on record
Bethany Ellen Hickson Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
KERRY DAY Trustee 22 October 2020
None on record
Erica Splawnyk Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
OSYP SPLAWNYK Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
Valerie Devlin Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
Sue Phillips Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
KAREN WESLEY Trustee 14 May 2015
None on record
PETE DEVLIN Trustee 19 April 2015
TAMESIDE EAST FOODBANK
Received: On time
Ben Hayes Trustee 13 April 2014
None on record
LUCY MARY LEECH Trustee 14 July 2013
None on record
IAN LEECH Trustee 14 April 2011
None on record
WENDY CLIFFORD Trustee
None on record
BARRY SELBY Trustee
None on record
PATRICIA MARGARET BRADSHAW Trustee
None on record
STUART RONALD PHILLIPS Trustee
None on record