KIRKBY LONSDALE ARTS SCENE

Charity number: 1137253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £889 £21.54k £702 £1.94k £1.92k
Total expenditure £259 £10.90k £264 £1.96k £1.69k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A