Financial history EARLHAM INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1136213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £18.86m £14.59m £12.61m £11.14m £14.26m
Total expenditure £14.70m £15.32m £14.10m £12.51m £13.41m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.50m £11.40m £10.70m £9.66m £11.33m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £802.00k £550.00k £438.00k £435.00k £319.00k
Income - Charitable activities £17.97m £13.93m £12.04m £10.65m £13.90m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £89.00k £107.00k £127.00k £56.00k £47.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.35m £15.06m £13.88m £12.43m £13.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £97.00k £72.00k £111.00k £95.00k £104.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £350.00k £260.00k £222.00k £83.00k £103.00k