Trustees EARLHAM INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1136213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Lars Magnus Rattray Trustee 21 June 2022
None on record
Dr Stephanie Joan Pilkington Trustee 21 June 2022
None on record
Professor Deborah Frances Smith Trustee 07 December 2021
None on record
Professor Philip Gilmartin Trustee 03 December 2019
None on record
Professor Tom Richards Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record
Professor Peter William Harold Holland Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record
Amanda Tagg Trustee 04 December 2018
None on record
Professor Edward Louis Trustee 20 June 2017
None on record
DR Alasdair Macnab Trustee 21 March 2017
None on record