TREE AID

Charity number: 1135156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 11 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 11 January 2017 On time Download