THE PARENT AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF THE STEINER ACADEMY HEREFORD

Charity number: 1135990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £69.44k £73.85k £70.49k £71.22k £78.45k
Total expenditure £71.06k £68.39k £77.12k £81.19k £75.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A