THE NATIONAL RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1134859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.20m £1.24m £1.29m £1.84m £1.24m
Total expenditure £1.15m £1.25m £1.14m £1.29m £1.29m
Income from government contracts £80.92k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £85.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £671.08k £525.06k £1.01m £1.43m £838.30k
Income - Other trading activities £89.78k £77.37k £41.48k £29.40k £37.10k
Income - Charitable activities £419.27k £612.88k £214.61k £356.70k £343.80k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.32k £24.45k £25.35k £29.20k £23.20k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £230.78k £117.72k £442.54k £760.40k £139.60k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £965.64k £983.42k £933.42k £1.06m £1.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £180.26k £262.96k £207.24k £228.60k £246.60k
Expenditure - Governance £42.54k £58.07k £45.63k £46.70k £47.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0