OM GROUP

Charity number: 1137356
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 03 March 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 08 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 05 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required