Barnet Hill Foundation

Charity number: 1136046
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 18 January 2021 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 18 January 2021 20 days late Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 25 October 2018 301 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 13 February 2017 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required