THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SUNNINGHILL AND SOUTH ASCOT

Charity number: 1135244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £259.72k £302.94k £284.59k £304.35k £262.28k
Total expenditure £302.67k £265.80k £280.72k £339.69k £302.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £3.30k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k