Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SUNNINGHILL AND SOUTH ASCOT
Charity number: 1135244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katharine Blanche Mary Bolsover | Chair | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Charlotte Tansley Jordan | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Margot Cross | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Christine Ward | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynnette Kimber | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosita Allan | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Francescon | Trustee | 30 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diana Arabella Marie-Christine Cameron | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Elizabeth Thomson | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Daphne Jean Stansfield | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Cummings | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Anna Charlotte Catheya | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Aled Pugh Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Stokes | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY NICHOLS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.