WEST STREET CHARITY

Charity number: 1135436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £410.87k £483.96k £500.67k £574.00k £180.27k
Total expenditure £256.08k £477.13k £498.24k £320.37k £128.03k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £500.67k £574.00k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £408.70k £207.41k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £89.54k £112.96k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £2.28k £2.41k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £406.42k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A