Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF OSSETT TRUST FUND

Charity number: 500908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £9.35k £6.90k £8.47k £10.29k £14.02k
Total expenditure £9.61k £7.42k £8.49k £10.11k £13.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A