Accounts and annual returns THE 24X7 SPECIAL NEEDS HOLIDAY TRUST

Charity number: 1136050
Charity reporting is overdue by 502 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 502 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 502 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window