Financial history THE 24X7 SPECIAL NEEDS HOLIDAY TRUST

Charity number: 1136050
Charity reporting is overdue by 504 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £147.59k £147.59k £70.71k £119.54k £28.28k
Total expenditure £178.11k £178.11k £54.48k £101.81k £39.21k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A