Financial history EDEN NETWORK GREATER LONDON

Charity number: 1137323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £3.96k £2.67k £2.37k £1.84k £1.34k
Total expenditure £19.00k £2.35k £1.52k £1.46k £546
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A