Trustees HOLY TRINITY THORPE HESLEY (ANGLICAN & METHODIST)

Charity number: 1136178
Charity reporting is up to date (125 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYNN BROADHEAD Chair 16 July 2015
ROTHERHAM AND DEARNE VALLEY CIRCUIT
Received: 14 days late
Sarah Elizabeth Marsh Trustee 02 May 2021
None on record
Pauline Margaret Armitage Trustee 02 May 2021
None on record
Gemma Ellson Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
David Jeremy Hester Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Julie Ann Shaw Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
Amy Adele Leonard Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
Caroline Stokoe Trustee 02 April 2017
None on record
JANE ELLEN HORE Trustee 20 May 2013
None on record
HILARY PERRY Trustee 20 May 2013
None on record
Donna Crookes Trustee 10 October 2012
None on record
FIONA WILSON Trustee
ROTHERHAM AND DEARNE VALLEY CIRCUIT
Received: 14 days late
ROTHERHAM SAMARITANS
Received: On time
KAY ELIZABETH HESTER Trustee
None on record