FAIR MONEY ADVICE

Charity number: 1138351
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £353.70k £473.00k £273.00k £267.12k £309.00k
Total expenditure £290.80k £420.00k £277.00k £247.51k £289.00k
Income from government contracts £188.70k £185.00k £176.00k N/A £248.00k
Income from government grants £12.50k £0 N/A £200.50k £29.00k