Financial history BEYOND FOOD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1136234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £16.68k £7.91k £226.48k £472.70k £488.08k
Total expenditure £208.12k £13.06k £221.07k £429.77k £480.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A