CHAIN LANE COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1137904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £23.31k £27.86k £25.30k £27.57k £32.06k
Total expenditure £21.38k £22.14k £20.45k £27.56k £22.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £1.28k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k