Accounts and annual returns PROTEKS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1137214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 July 2021 21 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 July 2020 19 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 July 2019 12 July 2020 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 July 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 July 2018 02 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 July 2017 17 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 July 2017 17 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window