Financial history PROTEKS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1137214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/07/2017 04/07/2018 04/07/2019 04/07/2020 04/07/2021
Total gross income £49.74k £42.22k £4.56k £4.44k £0
Total expenditure £51.33k £42.17k £4.56k £4.47k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A