TEESSIDE UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1136875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £3.03m £2.95m £3.43m £3.10m £2.71m
Total expenditure £3.17m £3.16m £3.60m £3.24m £2.76m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £128.77k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.34m £1.37m £1.76m £1.49m £1.60m
Income - Other trading activities £251.15k £274.14k £355.90k £374.00k £292.75k
Income - Charitable activities £1.44m £1.35m £1.32m £1.23m £814.86k
Income - Endowments £0 £40.43k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.04k £2.72k £164 £1.52k £2.97k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.96m £2.94m £3.32m £2.96m £2.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £210.28k £222.20k £286.67k £288.03k £255.29k
Expenditure - Governance £33.78k £33.50k £29.55k £32.38k £31.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0