UNIVERSITY OF EXETER STUDENTS' GUILD

Charity number: 1136468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £6.63m £6.32m £6.44m £6.75m £5.89m
Total expenditure £6.28m £7.45m £6.29m £7.18m £7.65m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £206.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.38m £2.05m £2.49m £2.69m £2.90m
Income - Other trading activities £257.37k £285.00k £285.00k £310.00k £233.50k
Income - Charitable activities £3.99m £3.98m £3.67m £3.75m £2.75m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.40k £2.00k £1.00k £1.00k £419
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.11m £7.19m £5.98m £7.07m £7.55m
Expenditure - Raising funds £166.57k £262.00k £164.00k £105.00k £95.41k
Expenditure - Governance £80.07k £76.00k £82.00k £84.00k £91.03k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £150.00k £0 £0