Financial history NEWPORT AND LOWER WYE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1137596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £317.94k £294.64k £301.64k £254.41k £327.09k
Total expenditure £365.33k £399.51k £307.43k £318.92k £318.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £3.93k