Trustees NEWPORT AND LOWER WYE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1137596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

40 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV Les Jones Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Patricia Dicker Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Dr STUART NUTTALL Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record
REV Gordon Gresswell Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Alison McBain Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Ann Langford Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Roger John Langford Trustee 01 March 2015
None on record
Janice Morgan Trustee 30 August 2013
None on record
MARY THERESA HANDO Trustee 31 May 2013
None on record
BRIDGET RUTH GIBBS Trustee 30 May 2013
None on record
GARETH EDWARDS Trustee 30 May 2013
None on record
CAROL ANNE ALDRIDGE Trustee 01 September 2012
None on record
PAULA PARISH-FOLEY Trustee 31 August 2012
None on record
MIRIAM EVA HAM Trustee 09 June 2011
None on record
Hazel Esme Bennett Trustee 01 September 2010
None on record
MRS SALLY SHEA Trustee 01 September 2006
None on record
ELIZABETH JILL ELLIS Trustee 01 September 1996
None on record
MR MIKE ROBERTS Trustee
MONMOUTH AND DISTRICT FOODBANK
Received: On time
Michael Gray Trustee
CROSSKEYS SILVER BAND
Received: On time
Martin Lougher BSc, BArch Trustee
Methodist Conference Property at Central Hall Westminster
Received: On time
MRS PAM LLOYD Trustee
NEW GROVE TRUST
Received: On time
KEITH MAURICE HARVEY Trustee
CHEPSTOW METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
MRS LIZ HICKS Trustee
None on record
MARION EVELYN MARINA EDWARDS Trustee
None on record
HUGH DAVID KNOYLE Trustee
None on record
MALCOLM HEDLEY DEAN Trustee
None on record
MARGARET NICHOLAS Trustee
None on record
JOHN COBBETT HEALEY Trustee
None on record
SIAN LLEWELYN Trustee
None on record
Alf Waldron Trustee
None on record
IRENE ANNE SCOWCROFT Trustee
None on record
RUTH GRAY F.C.L. Trustee
None on record
ANN WALDRON Trustee
None on record
SANDRA HANBURY Trustee
None on record
MR MIKE STRANGE Trustee
None on record
PENNY BLAKEMORE Trustee
None on record
SARAH - JANE JONES MAAT Trustee
None on record
MRS AVRIL SMITH Trustee
None on record
ROBIN THOMAS ALAN HILL Trustee
None on record
NASSIM HILU B.Eng MSC. Trustee
None on record