PAULINE MEREDITH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1139585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 11/03/2016 11/03/2017 11/03/2018 11/03/2019 11/03/2020
Total gross income £84.70k £114.72k £164.51k £129.31k £56.43k
Total expenditure £59.73k £116.26k £172.95k £142.08k £58.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A