INTERNATIONAL AID FOR THE PROTECTION AND WELFARE OF ANIMALS

Charity number: 1137532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 27 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 20 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 30 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 30 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 20 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 20 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 21 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 21 December 2016 On time Download